NY S03032 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a civil cause of action for human trafficking.
Title
Relates to a civil cause of action for human trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1422 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3032A |
2019-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A08451 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - enacting clause stricken