NY S03040 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-07 - PRINT NUMBER 3040C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-07 - PRINT NUMBER 3040C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "marihuana regulation and taxation act"; relates to the description of marihuana, and the growing of and use of marihuana by persons twenty-one years of age or older; makes technical changes regarding the definition of marihuana; relates to the qualification of certain offenses involving marihuana and exempts certain persons from prosecution for the use, consumption, display, production or distribution of marihuana; provides for the licensure of persons authorized to produce, process and sell marihuana; levies an excise tax on certain sales of marihuana; repeals certain provisions of the penal law relating to the criminal sale of marihuana and provisions of the general business law relating to drug paraphernalia; creates the New York state marihuana revenue fund, the New York state community grants reinvestment fund, and the marihuana microbusiness and marihuana license revolving loan fund; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Enacts the "marihuana regulation and taxation act"; relates to the description of marihuana, and the growing of and use of marihuana by persons twenty-one years of age or older; makes technical changes regarding the definition of marihuana; relates to the qualification of certain offenses involving marihuana and exempts certain persons from prosecution for the use, consumption, display, production or distribution of marihuana; provides for the licensure of persons authorized to produce, process and sell marihuana; levies an excise tax on certain sales of marihuana; repeals certain provisions of the penal law relating to the criminal sale of marihuana and provisions of the general business law relating to drug paraphernalia; creates the New York state marihuana revenue fund, the New York state community grants reinvestment fund, and the marihuana microbusiness and marihuana license revolving loan fund; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3040C |
2018-11-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3040B |
2017-06-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-06-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3040A |
2017-06-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03506 (Same As) 2018-11-16 - print number 3506c