NY S03058 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of carolina fanwort, which is scientifically known as cabomba caroliniana grey.
Title
Prohibits the sale of carolina fanwort, which is scientifically known as cabomba caroliniana grey.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.86 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2013-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03891 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation