NY S03058 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for free hunting, fishing and trapping licenses to residents of the state who are active duty members of the U.S. armed forces regardless of where such person is stationed.
Title
Provides for free hunting, fishing and trapping licenses to residents of the state who are active duty members of the U.S. armed forces regardless of where such person is stationed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2016-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.583 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1447 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A05292 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to environmental conservation