NY S03060 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of North Hempstead, county of Nassau, to convey to Carle Place Water District certain parklands.
Title
Authorizes the town of North Hempstead, county of Nassau, to convey to Carle Place Water District certain parklands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.331 |
2011-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.330 |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a5852 |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-03 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2011-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.337 |
2011-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05852 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - substituted by s3060