NY S03060 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "oil and gas waste management act of 2016" to require solid waste management facilities accepting waste from oil and gas drilling operations to screen such waste for radioactivity.
Title
Enacts the "oil and gas waste management act of 2016" to require solid waste management facilities accepting waste from oil and gas drilling operations to screen such waste for radioactivity.
Sponsors
Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Carl Marcellino [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2016-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.191 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3060A |
2016-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-04-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-04-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-04-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.355 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |