NY S03060 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - PRINT NUMBER 3060E
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes a tax on the transfer of certain real property within two years of the prior transfer of such property and provides for exemptions from such tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes a tax on the transfer of certain real property within two years of the prior transfer of such property and provides for exemptions from such tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 3060E
2019-05-14SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES
2019-04-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 3060D
2019-04-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES
2019-04-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 3060C
2019-04-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES
2019-03-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 3060B
2019-03-26SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES
2019-02-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 3060A
2019-02-21SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES
2019-02-01SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

Same As/Similar To

A05375 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - print number 5375a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03060&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03060&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03060
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03060&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03060A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03060&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03060B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03060&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03060C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03060&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03060D
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03060&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03060E

Bill Comments

feedback