NY S03065 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the residential structure fire prevention act of 2018; provides a tax credit to homeowners who remove cock loft fire hazards in their homes; provides an insurance discount for the installation of smoke detecting alarm devices in cock lofts; provides that the repair of cock lofts for the purpose of fire prevention and safety shall be qualifying expenditures under state housing programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the residential structure fire prevention act of 2018; provides a tax credit to homeowners who remove cock loft fire hazards in their homes; provides an insurance discount for the installation of smoke detecting alarm devices in cock lofts; provides that the repair of cock lofts for the purpose of fire prevention and safety shall be qualifying expenditures under state housing programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.308
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.271
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a1878b
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-18AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenateREPASSED SENATE
2018-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3065B
2018-06-12SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-12Senatereturned to senate
2018-06-12AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1637
2018-06-07SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-15SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-03-19SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2018-01-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 2065A
2018-01-04SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1623
2017-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-01-19SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A01878 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s3065b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03065&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03065&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03065
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03065&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03065A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03065&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03065B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3065#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3065#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3065#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3065#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3065#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S3065#SF3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03065&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback