NY S03103 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the problem gambling advisory council.
Title
Establishes the problem gambling advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3103A |
2019-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.228 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A00590 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE