NY S03106 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a 120-day warning period for violations at congressionally chartered veterans' organization facilities.
Title
Requires a 120-day warning period for violations at congressionally chartered veterans' organization facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2019-04-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.344 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A01810 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to veterans' affairs