NY S03131 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 3131A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 3131A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows salary and civil service exam credits for police officers in certain cities and property tax credits for resident officers and student loan forgiveness program for certain police officers.
Title
Allows salary and civil service exam credits for police officers in certain cities and property tax credits for resident officers and student loan forgiveness program for certain police officers.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Huntley [D] | Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3131A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06802 (Same As) 2012-05-15 - held for consideration in governmental employees