NY S03131 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5940C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5940C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the care and treatment of injured employees by licensed or certified acupuncturists under the workers' compensation program.
Title
Authorizes the care and treatment of injured employees by licensed or certified acupuncturists under the workers' compensation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5940C |
2013-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1555 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Senate | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 3131A |
2013-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3131B |
2013-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3131A |
2013-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2013-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05940 (Same As) 2013-09-27 - tabled