NY S03131 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Syracuse to add unpaid housing code violation penalties, costs and fines to the city's annual tax levy.
Title
Authorizes the city of Syracuse to add unpaid housing code violation penalties, costs and fines to the city's annual tax levy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3131A |
2018-06-18 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1542 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1048 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00416 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.123