NY S03133 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to testimony related to voter's signature on a petition.
Title
Relates to testimony related to voter's signature on a petition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.533 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1538 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3133 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.312 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.312 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A120 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1538 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00120 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.533