NY S03137 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6761A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the New York state department of transportation to conduct a study to evaluate the configuration and signage of entrance and exit ramps on the Southern State Parkway in Nassau and Suffolk counties to determine whether adequate safety measures exist to prevent collisions and the instance of wrong way drivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the New York state department of transportation to conduct a study to evaluate the configuration and signage of entrance and exit ramps on the Southern State Parkway in Nassau and Suffolk counties to determine whether adequate safety measures exist to prevent collisions and the instance of wrong way drivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A6761A
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1543
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 3137A
2018-05-09SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-13Assemblyreferred to transportation
2017-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1441
2017-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-01-19SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A06761 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - signed chap.361

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback