NY S03137 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts a debtor's interest in his or her rent-stabilized lease from bankruptcy proceedings.
Title
Exempts a debtor's interest in his or her rent-stabilized lease from bankruptcy proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.403 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00044 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary