NY S03140 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - signed chap.412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - signed chap.412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to publishing local campaign contribution limits.
Title
Relates to publishing local campaign contribution limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | Senate | signed chap.412 |
2019-10-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.163 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3140 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-02-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.11 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-03-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A111 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.163 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00111 (Same As) 2019-10-25 - signed chap.412