NY S03146 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - signed chap.417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - signed chap.417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a board of election to design an alternative poll site staffing plan to conduct an election.
Title
Allows a board of election to design an alternative poll site staffing plan to conduct an election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | signed chap.417 |
2019-10-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1678 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3146 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.323 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.323 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-28 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1454 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1678 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01454 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - signed chap.417