NY S03167 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to government vendor contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to government vendor contributions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05Assemblyreferred to election law
2019-03-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-27Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.165
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00113 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - referred to election law

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback