NY S03168 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - signed chap.382
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - signed chap.382
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing certain special accidental death benefits; increases the special accidental death benefit paid to a widow or widower or the deceased member's children under the age of eighteen, or if a student, under the age of twenty-three.
Title
Relates to increasing certain special accidental death benefits; increases the special accidental death benefit paid to a widow or widower or the deceased member's children under the age of eighteen, or if a student, under the age of twenty-three.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | Senate | signed chap.382 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1679 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3168B |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.76 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | rules report cal.76 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-17 | Senate | print number 4079b |
2019-05-17 | Senate | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-02-07 | Senate | print number 4079a |
2019-02-07 | Senate | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-02-01 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4079B |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1679 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3168B |
2019-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3168A |
2019-02-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04079 (Same As) 2019-10-22 - signed chap.382