NY S03171 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on October 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - signed chap.375
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on October 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - signed chap.375
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes patient protections from excessive hospital emergency charges; includes hospital charges, including hospital charges for inpatient services which follow an emergency room visit.
Title
Establishes patient protections from excessive hospital emergency charges; includes hospital charges, including hospital charges for inpatient services which follow an emergency room visit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-17 | Senate | signed chap.375 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1598 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3171A |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ruling of chair on point of order |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.65 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | rules report cal.65 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-17 | Senate | print number 264b |
2019-05-17 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2019-05-02 | Senate | print number 264a |
2019-05-02 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A264B |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1598 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3171A |
2019-05-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00264 (Same As) 2019-10-17 - signed chap.375