NY S03176 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the public service commission to implement rules requiring public utility companies to remove or relocate their utility poles when necessary for road improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the public service commission to implement rules requiring public utility companies to remove or relocate their utility poles when necessary for road improvements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-04-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.438
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback