NY S03185 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to amusement devices, attraction safety and inspection awareness; provides for the establishment of a publicly accessible website to provide awareness of the licensing and safety history of any amusement devices and attractions licensed in this state.
Title
Relates to amusement devices, attraction safety and inspection awareness; provides for the establishment of a publicly accessible website to provide awareness of the licensing and safety history of any amusement devices and attractions licensed in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2013-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.96 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A00435 (Same As) 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in labor