NY S03185 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 3185A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 3185A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. Daniel Squadron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3185A |
2016-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02430 (Same As) 2016-03-30 - REFERRED TO FINANCE