NY S03195 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the counting of an affidavit ballot of an eligible voter if such voter appeared at a polling place in the correct county but in the incorrect election district; provides that such vote shall not be cast and canvassed for such contests for which the person was not entitled to vote at such election.
Title
Requires the counting of an affidavit ballot of an eligible voter if such voter appeared at a polling place in the correct county but in the incorrect election district; provides that such vote shall not be cast and canvassed for such contests for which the person was not entitled to vote at such election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3195A |
2019-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03304 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to election law