NY S03203 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2112A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2112A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to BOCES intermediate districts.
Title
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to BOCES intermediate districts.
Sponsors
Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2112A |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1450 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3203A |
2018-04-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.831 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02112 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - tabled