NY S03211 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3211A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3211A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the interagency task force on health literacy, to study health literacy and develop recommendations for improving health literacy in this state.
Title
Establishes the interagency task force on health literacy, to study health literacy and develop recommendations for improving health literacy in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3211A |
2014-02-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2013-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09152 (Same As) 2014-03-20 - referred to higher education