NY S03215 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for increased fines for overnight parking of tractor-trailer combinations, tractors, truck trailers and semi-trailers on residential streets in the city of New York.
Title
Provides for increased fines for overnight parking of tractor-trailer combinations, tractors, truck trailers and semi-trailers on residential streets in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-03-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3215A |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.261 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01658 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation