NY S03238 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes courts, other than courts in a city of a million or more, to render default judgments in cases of failure to answer for unlawful possession of an alcoholic beverage with the intent to consume by persons under the age of twenty-one years; requires clerks to notify defendants prior to the plea and judgment being rendered; allows judgment to have full force and effect.
Title
Authorizes courts, other than courts in a city of a million or more, to render default judgments in cases of failure to answer for unlawful possession of an alcoholic beverage with the intent to consume by persons under the age of twenty-one years; requires clerks to notify defendants prior to the plea and judgment being rendered; allows judgment to have full force and effect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1071 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.945 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A04394 (Same As) 2018-04-17 - reported referred to codes