NY S03238 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "homeowner mortgage refinance relief act"; exempts from a local mortgage tax or recording tax mortgagors who are refinancing real property; provides that the commissioner shall promulgate rules and regulations to establish grounds for qualifications, proof and procedure necessary for a mortgagor to obtain such an exemption.
Title
Enacts the "homeowner mortgage refinance relief act"; exempts from a local mortgage tax or recording tax mortgagors who are refinancing real property; provides that the commissioner shall promulgate rules and regulations to establish grounds for qualifications, proof and procedure necessary for a mortgagor to obtain such an exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.177 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06886 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means