NY S03291 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the creation of a drug guide for seniors regarding the drugs commonly used by people over 62 years of age; provides that such guide will include functions and drug interactions.
Title
Provides for the creation of a drug guide for seniors regarding the drugs commonly used by people over 62 years of age; provides that such guide will include functions and drug interactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.261 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.332 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | substituted for a2326a |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.158 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A02326 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.261