NY S03296 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "patient privacy protection act"; prohibits interviews of other party's treating physicians or health care providers in personal injury, medical, dental, or podiatric malpractice or wrongful death actions.
Title
Enacts the "patient privacy protection act"; prohibits interviews of other party's treating physicians or health care providers in personal injury, medical, dental, or podiatric malpractice or wrongful death actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.263 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.739 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3296A |
2011-04-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2011-03-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00694 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.49