NY S03297 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits robocalls to state residents and requires telephone service providers to offer free call mitigation technology to telephone customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits robocalls to state residents and requires telephone service providers to offer free call mitigation technology to telephone customers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-01-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.235
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3297D
2019-06-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3297C
2019-05-15SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3297B
2019-03-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-27Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-26Senate1ST REPORT CAL.318
2019-03-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 3297A
2019-03-12SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2019-02-05SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00675 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03297&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03297&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03297
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03297&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03297A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03297&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03297B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03297&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03297C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03297&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03297D
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3297#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3297#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3297#SC2

Bill Comments

feedback