NY S03299 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes in the class E felony of vehicular assault in the second degree, the causing of serious physical injury while operating a vehicle with suspended, revoked or no license.
Title
Includes in the class E felony of vehicular assault in the second degree, the causing of serious physical injury while operating a vehicle with suspended, revoked or no license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-04-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.475 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.919 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03759 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes