NY S03301 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes licensed authorized organizations to conduct certain poker tournaments as licensed games of chance fundraisers.
Title
Authorizes licensed authorized organizations to conduct certain poker tournaments as licensed games of chance fundraisers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.364 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2019-04-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.376 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A07307 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to racing and wagering