NY S03314 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-15 - AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 3314A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-15 - AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 3314A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts Carlos' law; relates to crimes involving the death or injury of a worker; establishes higher fines for corporations who commit such crimes; establishes the crimes of endangering the welfare of a worker in the third, second and first degrees.
Title
Enacts Carlos' law; relates to crimes involving the death or injury of a worker; establishes higher fines for corporations who commit such crimes; establishes the crimes of endangering the welfare of a worker in the third, second and first degrees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | Senate | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 3314A |
2020-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3314B |
2020-02-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3314A |
2019-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.216 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04508 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.171