NY S03329 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires department of transportation to defer to the town board of the town of Riverhead, requests for speed limit changes on town highways.
Title
Requires department of transportation to defer to the town board of the town of Riverhead, requests for speed limit changes on town highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Senate | signed chap.364 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1680 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3329 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.138 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.138 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5806 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1680 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05806 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - signed chap.364