NY S03337 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3337C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the statute of limitations for public water suppliers and wholesale water suppliers to commence an action for injury to property shall be three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the statute of limitations for public water suppliers and wholesale water suppliers to commence an action for injury to property shall be three years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3337C
2019-05-20SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-20Senatereturned to senate
2019-05-20AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-07Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2019-05-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-01SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3337B
2019-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.305
2019-03-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 3337A
2019-03-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2019-02-05SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05477 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - reported referred to codes

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03337&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03337&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03337
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03337&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03337A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03337&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03337B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03337&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03337C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3337#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3337#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback