NY S03343 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring employers to provide employees notice of their sexual harassment prevention policy and sexual harassment prevention training program in writing in English and in employees' primary languages; requires the commissioner of labor to create dual-language templates of model sexual harassment prevention policies and training programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring employers to provide employees notice of their sexual harassment prevention policy and sexual harassment prevention training program in writing in English and in employees' primary languages; requires the commissioner of labor to create dual-language templates of model sexual harassment prevention policies and training programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.154
2019-02-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 3343A
2019-02-06SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2019-02-05SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A03646 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - print number 3646a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback