NY S03344 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A364B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the professional certification of doulas; only those certified may provide doula services defined as continuous emotional and physical support provided by a certified doula throughout labor and birth, and intermittently during the prenatal and postpartum periods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the professional certification of doulas; only those certified may provide doula services defined as continuous emotional and physical support provided by a certified doula throughout labor and birth, and intermittently during the prenatal and postpartum periods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A364B
2019-06-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3344B
2019-06-05SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-05Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-05AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-15Assemblyreferred to health
2019-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-30SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3344A
2019-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.243
2019-02-05SenateREFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES

Same As/Similar To

A00364 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03344&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03344&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03344
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03344&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03344A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S03344&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S03344B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3344#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3344#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S3344#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback