NY S03348 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding service of process to the department of state in the city of New York.
Title
Relates to expanding service of process to the department of state in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.431 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-04-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.289 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03300 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means