NY S03353 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - signed chap.660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - signed chap.660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires informed consent for procedures done in the course of education or training.
Title
Requires informed consent for procedures done in the course of education or training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.660 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.456 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3353 |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.117 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-06 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-05-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4988 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.456 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04988 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - signed chap.660