NY S03358 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits owners, lessors or agents thereof from assessing a lessee any fee for legal services in connection with any operation or rental of a residential unit unless the owner, lessor or agent has the legal authority to do so.
Title
Prohibits owners, lessors or agents thereof from assessing a lessee any fee for legal services in connection with any operation or rental of a residential unit unless the owner, lessor or agent has the legal authority to do so.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.450 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3358A |
2019-04-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02623 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes