NY S03362 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8292A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8292A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facility program within the urban development corporation; provides grant funding to local development corporations, municipalities, educational institutions and not-for-profit entities for the development or expansion of kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facilities which make available services such as food production, technical assistance, business management and marketing, distribution, storage and retailing assistance, particularly in economically distressed areas.
Title
Establishes a kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facility program within the urban development corporation; provides grant funding to local development corporations, municipalities, educational institutions and not-for-profit entities for the development or expansion of kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facilities which make available services such as food production, technical assistance, business management and marketing, distribution, storage and retailing assistance, particularly in economically distressed areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8292A |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2102 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3362A |
2018-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08292 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - tabled