NY S03378 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the rights and working conditions of emergency medical technicians employed by the New York city fire department; requires rest and meal breaks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the rights and working conditions of emergency medical technicians employed by the New York city fire department; requires rest and meal breaks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1293
2019-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-19SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-02-06SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback