NY S03387 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes lactation counseling services without a referral from a physician, registered physician assistant, registered nurse practitioner, or licensed midwife.
Title
Authorizes lactation counseling services without a referral from a physician, registered physician assistant, registered nurse practitioner, or licensed midwife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.54 |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.668 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.333 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | substituted for a2345 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.244 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2019-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02345 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.54