NY S03392 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - ordered to third reading rules cal.248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the uniform treatment of waste from the exploration, development, extraction, or production of crude oil or natural gas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the uniform treatment of waste from the exploration, development, extraction, or production of crude oil or natural gas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.248
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a2655
2019-06-03Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2019-06-03SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-03SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1136
2019-06-03SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-02-06SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A02655 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - substituted by s3392

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback