NY S03399 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-07SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 3399A
2019-05-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.516
2019-02-06SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A04853 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - substituted by s5685

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback