NY S03412 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the care and collection of abandoned animals on vacant property; requires notification to the appropriate authorities by anyone authorized to be on vacant land where such person finds an animal which based on its physical appearance or lack of available food or water appears abandoned, within six hours of an encounter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the care and collection of abandoned animals on vacant property; requires notification to the appropriate authorities by anyone authorized to be on vacant land where such person finds an animal which based on its physical appearance or lack of available food or water appears abandoned, within six hours of an encounter.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Domestic Animal Welfare Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2020-01-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-01-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-01-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-01-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.186
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.890
2019-02-06SenateREFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE

Same As/Similar To

A00750 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback