NY S03419 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the right of adoptees to receive a certified copy of their birth certificate upon reaching the age of 18, or if the adopted person is deceased, the adopted person's direct line descendants, or the lawful representative of such adopted person, or lawful representatives of such deceased adopted person's direct line descendants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the right of adoptees to receive a certified copy of their birth certificate upon reaching the age of 18, or if the adopted person is deceased, the adopted person's direct line descendants, or the lawful representative of such adopted person, or lawful representatives of such deceased adopted person's direct line descendants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.642
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a5494
2019-06-03Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-03SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.757
2019-02-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH
2019-02-06SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A05494 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s3419

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback